HASHIM WELFARE HOSPITAL APPEAL

Charity number: 1082330
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £83.99k £63.81k £124.82k £123.19k £123.44k
Total expenditure £75.40k £62.74k £131.49k £120.21k £109.39k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A