Financial history ST IVES DAY CARE CENTRE

Charity number: 1085214
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £126.25k £118.59k £118.27k £88.21k £61.09k
Total expenditure £125.32k £108.00k £117.96k £61.98k £45.81k
Income from government contracts £67.07k £67.07k £67.07k £67.07k N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £10.00k £39.47k