Trustees NOTRE DAME SCHOOL COBHAM
Charity number: 1081875
Charity reporting is up to date (63 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
WANDA NASH | Chair | 19 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
Russell Granat | Trustee | 22 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
SISTER PATRICIA GRADY ODN | Trustee | 26 November 2019 |
|
|||||
Gerard Thomas Owens | Trustee | 26 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Gair | Trustee | 21 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sr Kathy Lynn Schneider | Trustee | 12 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Simon Frost | Trustee | 28 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sister Maria Nieves Escalada | Trustee | 21 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
SISTER ANNE GILL ODN | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.