Trustees THE NEW WOLSEY THEATRE COMPANY LIMITED
Charity number: 1082016
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sara Jane Corcoran | Chair | 10 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Colm Gerard James Seeley | Trustee | 26 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Jane Herber | Trustee | 26 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Laura Herbert | Trustee | 28 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Vickie Olive Brazier | Trustee | 28 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alice Louise Hardaker | Trustee | 02 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Nicola Sheppard | Trustee | 02 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marc Edward Bradbrook | Trustee | 02 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Matthew William Harrison | Trustee | 03 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Jane Woolley | Trustee | 04 June 2019 |
|
|||||
Catherine Frost | Trustee | 04 June 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.