Trustees INTER-CULTURAL YOUTH EXCHANGE (ICYE-UK) LTD
Charity number: 1081907
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Keith Donnelly | Chair | 20 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nidhi Mahendrabhai Patel | Trustee | 25 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Giovanni Mastroianni | Trustee | 06 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Maiedha Raza | Trustee | 06 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Oliver Flor | Trustee | 06 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ines Marian Newman | Trustee | 20 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Franziska Glas | Trustee | 21 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Allan Russell Taylor | Trustee | 21 November 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.