LIVING ROCK TRUST

Charity number: 1082876
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Other income £769.19k £712.85k £758.35k £864.12k £814.82k
Total expenditure £728.60k £732.96k £761.12k £816.56k £814.68k