Trustees THE CASSEL HOSPITAL CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity number: 1081677
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Oliver Dale | Chair | 24 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Professor Sally Glen | Trustee | 05 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Maureen Miller | Trustee | 21 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paul Jullien | Trustee | 21 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gareth John Williams | Trustee | 16 March 2020 |
|
|||||
Dr Julia Blazdell | Trustee | 06 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Brian Waters | Trustee | 06 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Linda Stradins | Trustee | 24 October 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.