HULL COUNCIL OF DISABLED PEOPLE

Charity number: 1082470
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 11 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 17 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

17 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 16 July 2019 166 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 16 July 2019 166 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 23 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

23 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 02 March 2017 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

02 March 2017 30 days late Download