Financial history THE KING GEORGE V PLAYING FIELD, ST ANN`S CHAPEL

Charity number: 1081972
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £7.27k £8.35k £8.50k £8.98k £8.35k
Total expenditure £7.27k £8.35k £8.50k £8.98k £8.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A