Trustees THOMSON REUTERS FOUNDATION
Charity number: 1082139
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID BINET | Chair |
|
|
|||||
MARGARET MENDI NJONJO | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
VIVIAN SCHILLER | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
MARY ALICE VUICIC | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
JAMES CLIFTON SMITH | Trustee | 07 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
NICOLE YOUNG | Trustee | 17 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN PECCARELLI | Trustee | 12 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN GIBSON | Trustee | 12 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
EILEEN LYNCH-SUSSAN | Trustee | 24 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
GEERT LINNEBANK | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.