Accounts and annual returns MANCHESTER MUSLIM FUNERAL COMMITTEE

Charity number: 1093101
Charity reporting is up to date (6 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2021 06 April 2022 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 06 April 2022 6 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2020 06 April 2022 371 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 06 April 2022 371 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2019 29 September 2020 182 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 29 September 2020 182 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2018 29 August 2019 151 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 29 August 2019 151 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2017 20 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

14 August 2018 136 days late Download Open in new window