Financial history Brixton Community Based Ltd

Charity number: 1082783
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £90.74k £80.46k £92.31k £91.53k £20.30k
Total expenditure £85.25k £86.16k £82.60k £131.68k £15.25k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £10.00k