Trustees WOKING HOSPICE
Charity number: 1082798
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kerry Louise Jarred | Trustee | 21 January 2021 |
|
|||||
Carina Ann Kemp | Trustee | 21 January 2021 |
|
|||||
Nicola Jane Eggers | Trustee | 12 December 2018 |
|
|||||
Susan Jane Gent | Trustee | 27 June 2018 |
|
|||||
TIMOTHY ANDREW STOKES | Trustee | 01 March 2017 |
|
|||||
Roy Anthony Jarvis | Trustee | 01 March 2017 |
|
|||||
Jon Richard Jagger | Trustee | 01 March 2017 |
|
|||||
Richard Michael Roberts | Trustee | 01 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Peter Goodyear | Trustee | 05 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
MARC LESLIE RIGGS | Trustee | 24 January 2013 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.