ST ALBANS CATHOLIC PRIMARY SCHOOL PTA

Charity number: 1083161
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £19.45k £18.47k £23.85k £26.72k £14.79k
Total expenditure £9.45k £40.04k £19.96k £22.91k £28.15k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A