KASHMIRI AND AFRICAN DEAF CHILDREN'S' TRUST

Charity number: 1086367
Charity reporting is up to date (7 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £123.48k £124.09k £116.76k £108.85k £87.09k
Total expenditure £86.32k £111.30k £94.84k £103.26k £99.63k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A