Trustees THE COMMUNITY SUPPORT NETWORK, SOUTH LONDON
Charity number: 1083649
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Augustine Isichei | Trustee | 14 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rascelles Mundle | Trustee | 09 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Clementina Avwenayeri Okorefe | Trustee | 11 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Abdul Rahman Tanko | Trustee | 06 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Adapoe | Trustee | 06 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
MANJULA ROY | Trustee | 15 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr SMARAJIT ROY | Trustee | 15 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Lennon | Trustee | 20 February 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.