Financial history HELEN MARY MCCOSH CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1086006
Charity reporting is overdue by 77 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £3.70k £3.70k £4.00k £4.00k £0
Total expenditure £1.50k £1.50k £2.40k £2.50k £2.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A