Accounts and annual returns PRISONERS EDUCATION TRUST

Charity number: 1084718
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 23 October 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 23 October 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 07 July 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 07 July 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 08 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 08 June 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 28 April 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 10 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 10 April 2019 On time Download Open in new window