Financial history HEATHERCOMBE BRAKE TRUST

Charity number: 1087001
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £940.04k £950.31k £1.10m £978.55k £418.35k
Total expenditure £924.09k £912.24k £1.06m £959.76k £833.34k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £231.02k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £8.17k £0 £0 N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £1.03k £776 N/A
Income - Charitable activities £928.75k £938.50k £1.03m £977.21k N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment £11.30k £3.64k £206 £566 N/A
Income - Other £0 £0 £70.62k £0 N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £924.09k £912.24k £1.06m £959.76k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance £9.78k £11.60k £10.44k £14.03k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A