ALMA JEAN HENRY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1093088
Charity reporting is up to date (32 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £16.02k £21.14k £41.46k £41.87k £39.34k
Total expenditure £10.23k £18.54k £11.87k £11.39k £13.32k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A