ASHBROOKE SPORTS CLUB LIMITED

Charity number: 1087978
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £499.33k £496.12k £470.64k £440.33k £512.71k
Total expenditure £442.95k £475.48k £451.48k £467.13k £512.24k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £44.99k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £96.18k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £416.41k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £110
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £350.43k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £161.81k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £12.13k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0