MUSLIM EDUCATIONAL CONSULTATIVE COMMITTEE

Charity number: 1093457
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £58.74k £62.10k £72.74k £64.02k £59.48k
Total expenditure £59.64k £61.45k £61.54k £63.99k £61.56k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £53.18k £62.08k N/A N/A N/A