AL-HUDA MARBLE ARCH ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1091773
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £10.00k £10.01k £10.03k £10.04k £10.01k
Total expenditure £20.75k £4.22k £2.32k £2.33k £2.55k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A