Financial history ST. CHAD'S CHURCH (BURTON-ON-TRENT) PRESERVATION TRUST

Charity number: 1090805
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £2.91k £2.55k £2.50k £2.48k £2.79k
Total expenditure £1.41k £6.00k £0 £40 £359
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A