BARRY COLTHAM MEMORIAL FUND

Charity number: 1086582
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £236 £47 £36 £46 £3.16k
Total expenditure £30.34k £458 £289 £155 £995
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A