Trustees MATTISHALL AND BURGH CHARITY
Charity number: 1085364
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR FRED GARNER | Chair | 01 December 2017 |
|
|||||
PAULINE COX | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|||||
RUTH STARLING | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
URBAN HAWKINS | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Eileen Ida Browne | Trustee | 08 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rev MARK ALLAN MCCAGHREY | Trustee | 21 September 2012 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.