Trustees THE WHITCHURCH AND DISTRICT U3A
Charity number: 1085699
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID LEWIS HOWELLS | Chair | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Peter WILLIAMS | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Vine | Trustee | 28 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jane Caine | Trustee | 28 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER JEAN WILSON | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Lavin | Trustee | 02 October 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.