THE MUSLIM WELFARE ASSOCIATION OF PORT TALBOT

Charity number: 1087430
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £37.81k £40.30k £58.72k £47.63k £45.28k
Total expenditure £30.48k £30.21k £49.56k £55.64k £46.51k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A