Trustees THE FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S CHURCH, STANDON
Charity number: 1088516
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DIANA MARGARET DALE | Chair | 01 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Alison Cooley | Trustee | 13 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev John Chitham | Trustee | 26 March 2019 |
|
|||||
Lee-Anne Brand | Trustee | 06 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL FINDLAY BAKER | Trustee | 01 May 2015 |
|
|||||
Sally Crook | Trustee | 01 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Mia Stone | Trustee | 01 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
STEPHANIE ANN STIRLING | Trustee | 04 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE TARRY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANN MARGARET BREARS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
A CAROLINE FRANKS | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.