Trustees ALPHA INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1086179
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
REVEREND NICKY GUMBEL Chair
THE CHURCH RENEWAL TRUST
Received: On time
Rev John Alexander Kirkpatrick Millar Trustee 21 August 2023
None on record
Richard Mark Hutchinson Trustee 27 July 2023
None on record
Rev Stephen Foster Trustee 25 July 2023
ST ALDATES MINISTRY CIO
Recently registered
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST ALDATES, OXFORD
Received: On time
ALDATE'S COMMUNITY TRANSFORMATION !NITIATIVES LTD
Received: On time
ST ALDATES PAROCHIAL CHARITY
Received: On time
Angelina Hutchinson Trustee 24 July 2023
None on record
Fopefoliwa Adelowo Trustee 25 September 2022
None on record
Gabriella Helland Trustee 15 September 2022
None on record
Rev James Matthew Mallon Trustee 09 September 2022
None on record
Rev Richard Michael Coates Trustee 24 March 2022
THE CHURCH RENEWAL TRUST
Received: On time
ST MELLITUS COLLEGE TRUST
Overdue by 13 days
ST PAUL'S THEOLOGICAL CENTRE
Received: On time
Andre Joseph Trustee 26 May 2021
None on record
Kathleen Wai Lin Chew Trustee 29 April 2020
ST PAUL'S THEOLOGICAL CENTRE
Received: On time
Robert Lee Gruenewald II Trustee 29 April 2019
None on record
Rev AL GORDON Trustee 24 September 2016
HACKNEY PARISH ALMSHOUSES CHARITY
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WEST HAM
Received: On time
MRS REBECCA STEWART Trustee
None on record
DATO SEOK HONG YEOH Trustee
None on record