Governing document EAST DURHAM PARTNERSHIP LIMITED
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11 MAY 1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 16 OCTOBER 2001 AND 27 NOVEMBER 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/02/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 10/06/2015
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, WITHIN THE UNITED KINGDOM, ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE AND IN PARTICULAR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND FURTHERANCE OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.