CHARITY OF SIR RICHARD WHITTINGTON

Charity number: 1087167
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £3.21m £3.61m £3.95m £3.95m £3.88m
Total expenditure £2.66m £2.20m £2.80m £4.67m £5.37m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £24.00k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £571.00k £673.00k £784.00k £844.00k £875.00k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.64m £2.93m £3.16m £3.11m £2.98m
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £24.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.32m £1.85m £2.50m £4.36m £5.10m
Expenditure - Raising funds £341.00k £349.00k £297.00k £309.00k £270.00k
Expenditure - Governance £21.00k £229.00k £64.00k £20.00k £80.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.00m £676.00k £1.27m £2.85m £3.81m
Expenditure - Investment management £341.00k £349.00k £297.00k £309.00k £270.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0