Trustees THE NATIONAL VEGETABLE SOCIETY
Charity number: 1088979
Charity reporting is up to date (91 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SANDRA HALL | Chair | 14 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
June Davies | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Owain Roberts | Trustee | 17 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Raymond Higgins | Trustee | 11 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
CECILIA JEAN FORRESTER | Trustee | 30 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Norman Dickinson | Trustee | 24 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Read | Trustee | 02 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Geoffry Wilson | Trustee | 21 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kelvin Victor Mason | Trustee | 07 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Clare Shenfield | Trustee | 10 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Ian Simpson | Trustee | 10 September 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.