Financial history THE 1837 SOCIETY

Charity number: 1088003
Charity reporting is overdue by 22 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £6.01k £6.01k £6.05k £6.79k £6.76k
Total expenditure £6.65k £2.46k £5.23k £0 £1.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A