Financial history DISABILITY ADVICE SERVICE LAMBETH

Charity number: 1087399
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £410.92k £400.88k £450.17k £540.61k £698.97k
Total expenditure £424.15k £438.10k £438.25k £517.97k £618.92k
Income from government contracts £309.70k £307.70k £317.31k £317.41k £329.86k
Income from government grants £2.00k N/A £5.44k £37.43k £72.16k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £411.77k £61.65k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £128.67k £618.82k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £159 £32
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £18.47k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £517.97k £618.92k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £1.30k £1.39k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0