Financial history WEST SCRAFTON WATER TRUST

Charity number: 1090925
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £6.74k £6.32k £6.93k £6.77k £6.80k
Total expenditure £3.48k £4.05k £5.05k £3.35k £8.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A