ZIMBABWE CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP

Charity number: 1090344
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £12.45k £7.00k £7.20k £6.00k £6.00k
Total expenditure £3.25k £3.00k £6.50k £5.45k £5.00k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A