Financial history ST MARY'S SCHOOL PTA

Charity number: 1087323
Charity reporting is up to date (6 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £21.70k £42.31k £23.64k £23.79k £14.31k
Total expenditure £30.28k £17.59k £30.47k £21.12k £11.52k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A