Financial history ST GEORGE'S DAY CHARITY CLUB WATFORD AND DISTRICT

Charity number: 1089631
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £20.43k £16.58k £16.53k £13.08k £6.68k
Total expenditure £19.96k £19.08k £17.11k £14.21k £6.81k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A