Governing document MORELAND TRUST HEALTH AND SOCIAL CARE
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 09/08/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/09/2003 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 19/09/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/07/2007 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 18/07/2011
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE ELDERLY IN WOLVERHAMPTON AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY TO THE AFRICAN CARIBBEAN ELDERLY PEOPLE BY THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION, ADVICE, SUPPORT AND A VOLUNTEER AND BEFRIENDING SERVICE AND BY SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
WOLVERHAMPTON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.