Financial history THE HELPERBY AND BRAFFERTON SPORTS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1089446
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £9.40k £2.06k £5.00k £3.70k £11.85k
Total expenditure £4.59k £3.97k £5.88k £4.20k £5.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £10.00k