Trustees East Radnorshire Care Limited
Charity number: 1088491
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jonathon Bower Protheroe | Trustee | 07 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Angela Margaret Yates | Trustee | 05 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Brian Bridges | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Owens | Trustee | 17 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Baynham | Trustee | 01 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Edwards | Trustee | 01 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Roger Curtis | Trustee | 09 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
DILWYN PRICE | Trustee | 23 November 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.