Governing document HEALING GARDENS OF THE WORLD LTD
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 19 JUNE 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 1 JULY 2001, 3 OCTOBER 2003 AND 26 NOVEMBER 2003. CERTIFICATE ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 16 OCTOBER 2003. as amended on 12 Mar 2019 as amended on 12 Aug 2019 as amended on 19 Sep 2019
Charitable objects
The charity’s objects (“Objects”) are specifically restricted to the following: (1) to advance public education in the classical teaching of yoga and meditation and to maintain and improve the standard of teaching yoga and meditation. (2) to promote and advance for the public benefit the study and practice of the therapeutic effects of yoga and meditation as a means of improving the mental and spiritual health of the community. (3) the relief of poverty and sickness of people anywhere in the world. (4) to promote for the public benefit the conservation of the environment by the protection and preservation of endangered and medicinal flora anywhere in the world (5) to promote community development in developing countries for the public benefit, including (but not exclusively) by: (i) relieving financial hardship in such communities; and (ii) advancing the education of the members of such communities in relation to the sustainable cultivation of endangered and medicinal flora.
Area of benefit
ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.