CHESHIRE CARERS CENTRE

Charity number: 1092606
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £1.03m £920.19k £702.99k £1.19m £991.63k
Total expenditure £1.01m £991.55k £782.54k £1.12m £1.05m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £126.40k £817.35k £707.85k
Income from government grants £989.91k £854.17k £500.00k £15.00k £15.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £11.39k £12.68k £21.05k £8.64k £11.75k
Income - Other trading activities £7.06k £20.62k £79.03k £69.74k £66.12k
Income - Charitable activities £1.01m £886.88k £602.91k £1.11m £913.76k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £61 £8 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.01m £991.55k £776.23k £1.10m £1.04m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £6.31k £12.29k £16.12k
Expenditure - Governance £6.39k £4.51k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0