Trustees The Institute for Agriculture and Horticulture

Charity number: 1091213
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Edward David Fursdon Chair 22 February 2021
None on record
Stephen Jacob Trustee 19 June 2023
None on record
Stephen Mark Oldfield Trustee 27 April 2022
None on record
Jonathan Joseph Florsheim Trustee 27 April 2022
None on record
John Stacey Haynes Trustee 27 April 2022
None on record
Rebecca Rhiannon Margaret Berry Trustee 27 April 2022
None on record
Alison Jill Greed Trustee 27 April 2022
None on record
Karen Jayne Quinton Trustee 22 March 2021
None on record
Richard David Morley Trustee 22 February 2021
None on record
Owen William Piper Trustee 22 February 2021
None on record
Janet Diana Swadling Trustee 26 December 2019
None on record
Beverly Joan Dixon Trustee 26 December 2019
None on record
Richard Longthorp Trustee
ROTARY CLUB OF HOWDEN TRUST FUND
Received: On time