Trustees ISLAND HOSPICE AND BEREAVEMENT SERVICE (UK)
Charity number: 1091353
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DEREK JAMES BODELL | Chair | 30 July 2012 |
|
|||||
Dr Charles Mazhude | Trustee | 20 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
DERMOTT JAMES MCDONALD | Trustee | 22 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rutendo Gwendolyn Gambe | Trustee | 26 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Claire Margaret Morris | Trustee | 09 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANNE-MARGUERITE LLOYD-WILLIAMS | Trustee | 30 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
ALAN Wilton BROOKS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.