Financial history ST CHARLES PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1088928
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £33.64k £36.40k £31.36k £20.47k £19.84k
Total expenditure £33.76k £48.66k £23.38k £22.36k £26.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A