Governing document THE HAVEBURY HOUSING PARTNERSHIP
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 09/05/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/05/2002 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 20/09/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/06/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03 OCT 2016
Charitable objects
1) THE RELIEF OF PERSONS IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES, THE AGED, PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES, AND CHRONICALLY SICK THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SUITABLE HOUSING; 2) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL OR OTHER LEISURE TIME FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR PERSONS IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES, THE AGED, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED AND CHRONICALLY SICK AND WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES; 3) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY; 4) TO CARRY ON FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY THE BUSINESS OF: I) PROVIDING HOUSES OR HOSTELS AND ANY ASSOCIATED AMENITIES FOR PERSONS IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES UPON TERMS APPROPRIATE TO THEIR MEANS; II) PROVIDING FOR AGED, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED (WHETHER MENTALLY OR PHYSICALLY) OR CHRONICALLY SICK PERSONS IN NEED THEREOF HOUSES OR HOSTELS AND ANY ASSOCIATED AMENITIES SPECIALLY DESIGNED OR ADAPTED TO MEET THE DISABILITIES AND REQUIREMENTS OF SUCH PERSONS; III) PROVIDING SERVICES, ADVICE OR ASSISTANCE UPON TERMS APPROPRIATE TO THEIR MEANS TO AGED, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED (WHETHER MENTALLY OR PHYSICALLY) OR CHRONICALLY SICK PERSONS IN NEED THEREOF IN ARRANGING OR CARRYING OUT WORKS OF IMPROVEMENT, REPAIR OR MAINTENANCE TO HOUSES OCCUPIED BY THEM, AND PROVIDING ANY ASSOCIATED AMENITIES. 5) THE PROMOTION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF URBAN AND RURAL REGENERATION IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: I) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING OR RETRAINING, PARTICULARLY AMONG UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE, AND PROVIDING UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE WITH WORK EXPERIENCE; II) THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT; III) THE CREATION OF TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES; IV) THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT OR PROVISION OF PUBLIC AMENITIES; V) THE PRESERVATION OF BUILDINGS OR SITES OF HISTORIC OR ARCHITECTURAL INTEREST; VI) THE PROTECTION OR CONSERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT; VII) THE PROVISION OF PUBLIC HEALTH FACILITIES AND CHILDCARE; VIII) THE PROMOTION OF PUBLIC SAFETY AND PREVENTION OF CRIME; IX) SUCH OTHER MEANS AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED SUBJECT TO PRIOR WRITTEN CONSENT OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS FOR ENGLAND AND WALES. 6) TO CARRY OUT ANY CHARITABLE OBJECT WHICH IS FROM TIME TO TIME NOT A PROHIBITED ACTIVITY UNDER THE HOUSING AND REGENERATION ACT 2008 FOR A REGISTERED PROVIDER OF SOCIAL HOUSING WHICH IS A NON-PROFIT ORGANISATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.