Financial history THE GARRARD FAMILY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1089152
Charity reporting is up to date (77 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023
Total gross income £85.40k £68.12k £31.18k £22.52k £12.56k
Total expenditure £69.00k £52.79k £48.56k £17.98k £25.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A