Governing document BINGHAM PENGUINS SWIMMING CLUB
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 07/04/2001 AS AMENDED ON 17/03/2002 AS AMENDED ON 10/05/2002 AS AMENDED ON 26/06/2011 AS AMENDED ON 10/06/2012
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES, THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS, IN PARTICULAR BY THE ESTABLISHMENT AND PROVISION OF A SWIMMING CLUB IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.